Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
State Of Texas, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by Office Of The Attorney General, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with Gonzalez, Phyllis presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2013 |
CategoryTitle Iv-D Paternity |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 28, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal Doc ID# 11 (Judicial Officer: Gonzalez, Phyllis )
Judge: : Gonzalez, Phyllis |
|
May 28, 2014 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing (1:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Gonzalez, Phyllis) 03/12/2014Reset by Court to 05/05/201405/05/2014Reset by Court to 05/28/2014
Judge: Gonzalez, Phyllis |
|
May 06, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice of Intent Dismiss Doc ID# 10 (Judicial Officer: Gonzalez, Phyllis )
Judge: : Gonzalez, Phyllis |
|
April 03, 2014 | Docket Event | Waiver of Service Doc ID# 9 | |
March 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing Doc ID# 8 (Judicial Officer: Gonzalez, Phyllis )
Judge: : Gonzalez, Phyllis |
|
February 03, 2014 | Docket Event | Precept to ServeCENICEROS ARREDONDO, REGINOServed02/17/2014Response Due03/10/2014Returned03/05/2014 | |
February 03, 2014 | Docket Event | CitationGarcia, Diana LucitaServed03/04/2014Response Due03/31/2014Returned03/31/2014 | |
February 03, 2014 | Docket Event | Precept to ServeMadrid, Jalil Daniel Returned Unserved 03/07/2014Returned03/07/2014 | |
February 03, 2014 | Docket Event | CitationMadrid, Jalil Daniel Returned Unserved 03/07/2014Returned03/07/2014 | |
February 03, 2014 | Docket Event | CitationCENICEROS ARREDONDO, REGINOServed02/17/2014Response Due03/10/2014Returned03/05/2014 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.