Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
State Of Texas, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case represented by Office Of The Attorney General, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with : Gonzalez, Phyllis presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2013 |
CategoryTitle Iv-D Child Support Review Order - P/C Relationship |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Gonzalez, Phyllis) 12/10/2019Reset by Court to 02/11/202002/11/2020Reset by Court to 04/07/202004/07/2020Reset by Court to 05/28/202005/28/2020Reset by Court to 06/30/2020
Judge: Gonzalez, Phyllis |
|
May 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing Doc ID# 26 (Judicial Officer: Gonzalez, Phyllis )
Judge: : Gonzalez, Phyllis |
|
March 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing Doc ID# 25 (Judicial Officer: Gonzalez, Phyllis )
Judge: : Gonzalez, Phyllis |
|
March 12, 2020 | Docket Event | CitationDEARDORFF, JOSHUA CHASEServed04/04/2020Response Due04/27/2020Returned05/12/2020 | |
February 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing Doc ID# 24 (Judicial Officer: Gonzalez, Phyllis )
Judge: : Gonzalez, Phyllis |
|
December 19, 2019 | Docket Event | CitationDEARDORFF, JOSHUA CHASE Unserved | |
December 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing Doc ID# 23 (Judicial Officer: Gonzalez, Phyllis )
Judge: : Gonzalez, Phyllis |
|
October 25, 2019 | Docket Event | CitationDEARDORFF, JOSHUA CHASE Unserved | |
October 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing Doc ID# 22 (Judicial Officer: Gonzalez, Phyllis )
Judge: : Gonzalez, Phyllis |
|
October 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Case Information Sheet Doc ID# 21 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.