Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Hauk, Jeanne filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Hauk, Ryan, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with Gonzalez, Jose M presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2013 |
CategoryProtective Orders |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Case Outcome TypeDismissal Without Prejudice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
Entry of Judgment Hearing CANCELED Entry of Judgment Hearing (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Gonzalez, Jose M) Dismissed Judge: Gonzalez, Jose M |
|
January 15, 2014 | Docket Event |
Suggestion of Death Doc ID# 7
Judge: Gonzalez, Jose M |
|
January 07, 2014 | Docket Event |
Protective Order Hearing (2:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Gutierrez, Yahara L.) Result: Cancelled
Judge: Gonzalez, Jose M |
|
January 06, 2014 | Docket Event |
Order Extending Protective Order Doc ID# 5 (Judicial Officer: Locke, Michele L. )
Judge: Gonzalez, Jose M |
|
January 03, 2014 | Docket Event |
Subpoena Return by Attorney Doc ID# 6
Judge: Gonzalez, Jose M |
|
December 27, 2013 | Docket Event |
CitationHAUK, RYANServed12/28/2013Response Due01/20/2014Returned12/30/2013
Judge: Gonzalez, Jose M |
|
December 27, 2013 | Docket Event |
Application for Protective Order Doc ID# 1
Judge: Gonzalez, Jose M |
|
December 27, 2013 | Docket Event |
Protective OrderHAUK, RYANServed12/27/2013Response Due01/20/2014Returned12/30/2013
Judge: Gonzalez, Jose M |
|
December 27, 2013 | Docket Event |
Case Screening Instrument Doc ID# 3
Judge: Gonzalez, Jose M |
|
December 27, 2013 | Docket Event |
Case Information Sheet Doc ID# 2
Judge: Gonzalez, Jose M |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.