Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Barcenas, Guadalupe A., filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Barcenas, Robert, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with Rodriguez, Jesus presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 25, 2013 |
CategoryDivorce - Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeDivorce Decree |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 17, 2015 | Docket Event |
Domestic Relations Order Doc ID# 40 (Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Jesus )
Judge: Rodriguez, Jesus |
|
April 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
Change of Address Doc ID# 39
Judge: Rodriguez, Jesus |
|
April 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
Change of Address Doc ID# 38
Judge: Rodriguez, Jesus |
|
February 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing Doc ID# 37 (Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Jesus )
Judge: Rodriguez, Jesus |
|
February 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
Decree of Divorce Doc ID# 36 (Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Jesus )
Judge: Rodriguez, Jesus |
|
February 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
Entry of Judgment Hearing (8:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Rodriguez, Jesus) 01/29/2015Reset by Court to 02/19/201502/19/2015Reset by Court to 02/27/201502/27/2015Reset by Court to 02/24/2015
Judge: Rodriguez, Jesus |
|
February 11, 2015 | Docket Event |
Hearing Request Form Doc ID# 35 (Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Jesus )
Judge: Rodriguez, Jesus |
|
February 11, 2015 | Docket Event |
Hearing Request Form Doc ID# 34 (Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Jesus )
Judge: Rodriguez, Jesus |
|
January 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
Findings and Recommendations Doc ID# 33 (Judicial Officer: Rodriguez, Jesus )
Judge: Rodriguez, Jesus |
|
January 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
Hearing Request Form Doc ID# 32 (Judicial Officer: Strathmann, Laura )
Judge: Rodriguez, Jesus |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.