Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Demattia, Anthony, filed a(n) Deceptive Trade Practices - Consumer case represented by Michael T O'Connor, against Syndicated Office Systems, Inc, represented by Mark N Osborn, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with Alvarez, Javier presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAlvarez, Javier Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 12, 2011 |
CategoryDeceptive Trade Practices |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaConsumer |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeDeceptive Trade Practices |
Case Outcome TypeAgreed Order |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 18, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Judgment Sent
Judge: Alvarez, Javier |
|
May 03, 2012 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order
Judge: Alvarez, Javier |
|
May 03, 2012 | Docket Event |
Letter Doc ID# 6
Judge: Alvarez, Javier |
|
January 24, 2012 | Docket Event |
Letter Doc ID# 5
Judge: Alvarez, Javier |
|
January 13, 2012 | Docket Event |
Answer Doc ID# 4
Judge: Alvarez, Javier |
|
December 16, 2011 | Docket Event |
CitationSyndicated Office Systems, IncServed12/29/2011Response Received01/13/2012Returned01/06/2012
Judge: Alvarez, Javier |
|
December 12, 2011 | Docket Event |
Request Doc ID# 3
Judge: Alvarez, Javier |
|
December 12, 2011 | Docket Event |
Original Petition (OCA) Doc ID# 1
Judge: Alvarez, Javier |
|
December 12, 2011 | Docket Event |
Case Information Sheet Doc ID# 2
Judge: Alvarez, Javier |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.