Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Fia Card Services N.A., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Michael J Scott, against Amon, Marie I, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 08, 2011 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeNonsuit |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 08, 2013 | Docket Event |
Dismiss Want of Prosecution CANCELED Dismiss Want of Prosecution (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Alvarez, Javier) Dismissed |
|
October 18, 2013 | Docket Event | Letter Doc ID# 7 | |
October 18, 2013 | Docket Event | Proposed Order | |
September 24, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice of Dismissal Hearing Doc ID# 6 | |
April 16, 2012 | Docket Event | Motion for Substitute Service Doc ID# 4 | |
April 16, 2012 | Docket Event | Order Granting Doc ID# 5 (Judicial Officer: Alvarez, Javier ) | |
December 13, 2011 | Docket Event | CitationAMON, MARIE IServed04/18/2012Returned04/23/2012 | |
December 08, 2011 | Docket Event | Case Information Sheet Doc ID# 2 | |
December 08, 2011 | Docket Event | Original Petition (OCA) Doc ID# 1 | |
December 08, 2011 | Docket Event | Request for Admissions Doc ID# 3 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.