Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Day, Kyele, filed a(n) Deceptive Trade Practices - Consumer case represented by Angelica Carreon-Beltran, against Contreras, Eric, represented by Jonathan H Huerta, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with Rangel, Bonnie Party(Day, Kyele; Contreras, EricSigned on 04/03/2013 presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRangel, Bonnie Party(Day, Kyele; Contreras, EricSigned on 04/03/2013 Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 08, 2011 |
CategoryDeceptive Trade Practices |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaConsumer |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeDeceptive Trade Practices |
Case Outcome TypeAgreed Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 15, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Judgment Sent
Judge: Rangel, Bonnie Party(Day, Kyele; Contreras, EricSigned on 04/03/2013 |
|
April 08, 2013 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Rangel, Bonnie)
Judge: Rangel, Bonnie Party(Day, Kyele; Contreras, EricSigned on 04/03/2013 |
|
April 04, 2013 | Docket Event |
Pre-Trial Hearing (2:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Rangel, Bonnie)
Judge: Rangel, Bonnie Party(Day, Kyele; Contreras, EricSigned on 04/03/2013 |
|
April 03, 2013 | Docket Event |
Settlement Doc ID# 16
Judge: Rangel, Bonnie Party(Day, Kyele; Contreras, EricSigned on 04/03/2013 |
|
April 03, 2013 | Docket Event |
Entry of Judgment/Dismissal Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Rangel, Bonnie)
Judge: Rangel, Bonnie Party(Day, Kyele; Contreras, EricSigned on 04/03/2013 |
|
March 21, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order of Court Setting
Judge: Rangel, Bonnie Party(Day, Kyele; Contreras, EricSigned on 04/03/2013 |
|
March 20, 2013 | Docket Event |
Entry of Judgment/Dismissal Hearing (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Rangel, Bonnie)
Judge: Rangel, Bonnie Party(Day, Kyele; Contreras, EricSigned on 04/03/2013 |
|
March 06, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order of Court Setting
Judge: Rangel, Bonnie Party(Day, Kyele; Contreras, EricSigned on 04/03/2013 |
|
March 05, 2013 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Rangel, Bonnie)
Judge: Rangel, Bonnie Party(Day, Kyele; Contreras, EricSigned on 04/03/2013 |
|
February 27, 2013 | Docket Event |
Order of Court Setting
Judge: Rangel, Bonnie Party(Day, Kyele; Contreras, EricSigned on 04/03/2013 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.