Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Midland Fundng Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Melvin Thathiah, against Gotaas, Daniel, represented by Eric M Brittain, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with Alvarez, Javier presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAlvarez, Javier Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 08, 2011 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeOrder For Non-Suit |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order
Judge: Alvarez, Javier |
|
February 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
Letter Doc ID# 6
Judge: Alvarez, Javier |
|
February 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
Notice of Non-Suit Doc ID# 7
Judge: Alvarez, Javier |
|
March 23, 2012 | Docket Event |
Letter Doc ID# 5
Judge: Alvarez, Javier |
|
February 24, 2012 | Docket Event |
Answer Doc ID# 4
Judge: Alvarez, Javier |
|
December 13, 2011 | Docket Event |
CitationGotaas, DanielServed02/02/2012Response Received02/24/2012Returned02/24/2012
Judge: Alvarez, Javier |
|
December 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
Case Information Sheet Doc ID# 2
Judge: Alvarez, Javier |
|
December 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
Request Doc ID# 3
Judge: Alvarez, Javier |
|
December 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
Original Petition (OCA) Doc ID# 1
Judge: Alvarez, Javier |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.