Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Central Mutual Insurance Company, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Christopher A Fusselman, against Saldana, Carlos Javier, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with Alvarez, Javier presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAlvarez, Javier Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 08, 2011 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeSummary Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
Release of Judgment Doc ID# 14
Judge: Alvarez, Javier |
|
March 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Writ of ExecutionSALDANA, CARLOS JAVIER Unserved
Judge: Alvarez, Javier |
|
March 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
Writ Request
Judge: Alvarez, Javier |
|
September 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
Letter Doc ID# 12
Judge: Alvarez, Javier |
|
September 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Written Discovery Doc ID# 13
Judge: Alvarez, Javier |
|
July 31, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Judgment Sent
Judge: Alvarez, Javier |
|
July 27, 2012 | Docket Event |
Motion for Summary Judgment (10:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Alvarez, Javier) Result: Granted
Judge: Alvarez, Javier |
|
June 21, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Doc ID# 10
Judge: Alvarez, Javier |
|
June 21, 2012 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing Doc ID# 11
Judge: Alvarez, Javier |
|
June 14, 2012 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order
Judge: Alvarez, Javier |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.