Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Safety Program Specialists, Inc, filed a(n) Other Civil case represented by Steven C James, against Soto, Manuel R, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with Moody, William E. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMoody, William E. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 07, 2011 |
CategoryOther Civil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 14, 2016 | Docket Event | AbstractSoto, Manuel R Unserved | |
July 13, 2016 | Docket Event | Abstract Requested Doc ID# 55 | |
June 24, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Judgment Sent | |
June 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
Bench Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Moody, William E.)
Judge: Moody, William E. |
|
April 18, 2016 | Docket Event | Order of Court Setting | |
April 04, 2016 | Docket Event | Order of Court Setting | |
April 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
Status Conference (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Moody, William E.)
Judge: Moody, William E. |
|
March 30, 2016 | Docket Event |
Status Conference CANCELED Status Conference (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Moody, William E.) Other Judge: Moody, William E. |
|
March 29, 2016 | Docket Event | Order of Court Setting | |
March 11, 2016 | Docket Event | Returned Mail Doc ID# 54 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.