Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Hamric, Genevieve, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Ruth Reyes, against Hamric, Gary Keith, represented by Michele L Locke, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with Bramblett, Robyne presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 30, 2010 |
CategoryDivorce - Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 07, 2013 | Docket Event | Other Pleading Doc ID# 1 | |
May 26, 2011 | Docket Event | Administrative Writ of Withholding | |
May 24, 2011 | Docket Event | Administrative Writ of Withholding | |
May 04, 2011 | Docket Event | NOA | |
May 04, 2011 | Docket Event | Notice of Place of Payment | |
January 20, 2011 | Docket Event | AFF | |
January 14, 2011 | Docket Event | Notice of Place of Payment | |
November 02, 2010 | Docket Event |
Uncontested Hearing (4:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Bramblett, Robyne)
Judge: Bramblett, Robyne |
|
September 17, 2010 | Docket Event | Agreed Temporary Orders | |
September 15, 2010 | Docket Event |
Temporary Restraining Order Hearing (11:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Bramblett, Robyne) Result: Agreed
Judge: Bramblett, Robyne |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.