Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
City Of El Paso, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Carmen Irene Perez, against The United States Of America, The State Of Texas, Rubio, Brisa M M, Rodriguez, Victor M, Reliable Investments, A Joint Venture, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with BACA, JOSE J. Converted Disposition:Party: THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, Disposition: DEFAULT JUDGMNT presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 11, 2001 |
CategoryTax Suit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 18, 2005 | Docket Event |
Release of Judgment
Judge: BACA, JOSE J. Converted Disposition:Party: THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, Disposition: DEFAULT JUDGMNT |
|
December 17, 2004 | Docket Event |
ORSR
Judge: BACA, JOSE J. Converted Disposition:Party: THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, Disposition: DEFAULT JUDGMNT |
|
August 01, 2003 | Docket Event |
Non-Jury Trial (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer BACA, JOSE J.)
Judge: BACA, JOSE J. Converted Disposition:Party: THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, Disposition: DEFAULT JUDGMNT |
|
June 19, 2003 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing
Judge: BACA, JOSE J. Converted Disposition:Party: THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, Disposition: DEFAULT JUDGMNT |
|
June 19, 2003 | Docket Event |
Final Hearing (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer BACA, JOSE J.)
Judge: BACA, JOSE J. Converted Disposition:Party: THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, Disposition: DEFAULT JUDGMNT |
|
April 10, 2003 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing
Judge: BACA, JOSE J. Converted Disposition:Party: THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, Disposition: DEFAULT JUDGMNT |
|
April 10, 2003 | Docket Event |
Amended Petition
Judge: BACA, JOSE J. Converted Disposition:Party: THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, Disposition: DEFAULT JUDGMNT |
|
April 08, 2003 | Docket Event |
Scheduling Conference (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer BACA, JOSE J.)
Judge: BACA, JOSE J. Converted Disposition:Party: THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, Disposition: DEFAULT JUDGMNT |
|
March 19, 2003 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing
Judge: BACA, JOSE J. Converted Disposition:Party: THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, Disposition: DEFAULT JUDGMNT |
|
March 07, 2003 | Docket Event |
Final Hearing (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Peca, Peter S.)
Judge: BACA, JOSE J. Converted Disposition:Party: THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, Disposition: DEFAULT JUDGMNT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.