Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
City Of El Paso, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Carmen Irene Perez, against Southwestern Bell Yellow Pages Inc., Huynh, Quang, Fedral Deposit Ins. Corp-New First City, Texas, Federal Deposit Ins. Corp-New First City, Texas, Federal Deposit Ins. Corp-First City, Texas, (total of 6) See All represented by Cynthia A Carlborg, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with MARQUEZ, EDWARD S. Converted Disposition:Party: FEDERAL DEPOSIT INS. CORP-NEW FIRST CITY, TEXAS, Disposition: DEFAULT JUDGMNT presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 06, 2001 |
CategoryTax Suit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 17, 2004 | Docket Event |
Release of Judgment
Judge: MARQUEZ, EDWARD S. Converted Disposition:Party: FEDERAL DEPOSIT INS. CORP-NEW FIRST CITY, TEXAS, Disposition: DEFAULT JUDGMNT |
|
June 26, 2003 | Docket Event |
Notice of Default Judgment
Judge: MARQUEZ, EDWARD S. Converted Disposition:Party: FEDERAL DEPOSIT INS. CORP-NEW FIRST CITY, TEXAS, Disposition: DEFAULT JUDGMNT |
|
June 24, 2003 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Last Address
Judge: MARQUEZ, EDWARD S. Converted Disposition:Party: FEDERAL DEPOSIT INS. CORP-NEW FIRST CITY, TEXAS, Disposition: DEFAULT JUDGMNT |
|
June 23, 2003 | Docket Event |
Final Hearing (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Marquez, Edward S.) Result: Granted
Judge: MARQUEZ, EDWARD S. Converted Disposition:Party: FEDERAL DEPOSIT INS. CORP-NEW FIRST CITY, TEXAS, Disposition: DEFAULT JUDGMNT |
|
May 06, 2003 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing
Judge: MARQUEZ, EDWARD S. Converted Disposition:Party: FEDERAL DEPOSIT INS. CORP-NEW FIRST CITY, TEXAS, Disposition: DEFAULT JUDGMNT |
|
February 21, 2003 | Docket Event |
Civil Service Answer Default (Response Case Event)
Judge: MARQUEZ, EDWARD S. Converted Disposition:Party: FEDERAL DEPOSIT INS. CORP-NEW FIRST CITY, TEXAS, Disposition: DEFAULT JUDGMNT |
|
February 20, 2003 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Continuance
Judge: MARQUEZ, EDWARD S. Converted Disposition:Party: FEDERAL DEPOSIT INS. CORP-NEW FIRST CITY, TEXAS, Disposition: DEFAULT JUDGMNT |
|
February 17, 2003 | Docket Event |
Motion for Continuance
Judge: MARQUEZ, EDWARD S. Converted Disposition:Party: FEDERAL DEPOSIT INS. CORP-NEW FIRST CITY, TEXAS, Disposition: DEFAULT JUDGMNT |
|
February 12, 2003 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing
Judge: MARQUEZ, EDWARD S. Converted Disposition:Party: FEDERAL DEPOSIT INS. CORP-NEW FIRST CITY, TEXAS, Disposition: DEFAULT JUDGMNT |
|
February 10, 2003 | Docket Event |
Final Hearing (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Marquez, Edward S.) Result: RESET
Judge: MARQUEZ, EDWARD S. Converted Disposition:Party: FEDERAL DEPOSIT INS. CORP-NEW FIRST CITY, TEXAS, Disposition: DEFAULT JUDGMNT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.