Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
City Of El Paso, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Carmen Irene Perez, against Mowad, Phillip, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with Villa, Carlos Converted Disposition:Party: MOWAD, PHILLIP Disposition: DEFAULT JUDGMNT presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 06, 2001 |
CategoryTax Suit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 07, 2003 | Docket Event |
Release of Judgment
Judge: Villa, Carlos Converted Disposition:Party: MOWAD, PHILLIP Disposition: DEFAULT JUDGMNT |
|
September 29, 2003 | Docket Event |
Notice of Default Judgment
Judge: Villa, Carlos Converted Disposition:Party: MOWAD, PHILLIP Disposition: DEFAULT JUDGMNT |
|
September 12, 2003 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Last Address
Judge: Villa, Carlos Converted Disposition:Party: MOWAD, PHILLIP Disposition: DEFAULT JUDGMNT |
|
September 12, 2003 | Docket Event |
Bill of Cost
Judge: Villa, Carlos Converted Disposition:Party: MOWAD, PHILLIP Disposition: DEFAULT JUDGMNT |
|
September 05, 2003 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Continuance
Judge: Villa, Carlos Converted Disposition:Party: MOWAD, PHILLIP Disposition: DEFAULT JUDGMNT |
|
August 28, 2003 | Docket Event |
Non-Jury Trial (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Villa, Carlos)
Judge: Villa, Carlos Converted Disposition:Party: MOWAD, PHILLIP Disposition: DEFAULT JUDGMNT |
|
June 17, 2003 | Docket Event |
Order for Rule 165A of the TX Rules of Civil Procedure
Judge: Villa, Carlos Converted Disposition:Party: MOWAD, PHILLIP Disposition: DEFAULT JUDGMNT |
|
June 13, 2003 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Hearing (11:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Villa, Carlos) Result: Heard
Judge: Villa, Carlos Converted Disposition:Party: MOWAD, PHILLIP Disposition: DEFAULT JUDGMNT |
|
May 20, 2003 | Docket Event |
Amended Petition
Judge: Villa, Carlos Converted Disposition:Party: MOWAD, PHILLIP Disposition: DEFAULT JUDGMNT |
|
March 12, 2003 | Docket Event |
Notice of Intent to Dismiss for Want of Prosecution
Judge: Villa, Carlos Converted Disposition:Party: MOWAD, PHILLIP Disposition: DEFAULT JUDGMNT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.