Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
City Of El Paso, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Edward Hernandez, against Salazar, Fred, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with Peca, Peter S. Converted Disposition:Party: SALAZAR, FRED Disposition: DEFAULT JUDGMNT presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePeca, Peter S. Converted Disposition:Party: SALAZAR, FRED Disposition: DEFAULT JUDGMNT Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 18, 2000 |
CategoryTax Suit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 27, 2006 | Docket Event |
Release of Judgment
Judge: Peca, Peter S. Converted Disposition:Party: SALAZAR, FRED Disposition: DEFAULT JUDGMNT |
|
September 19, 2001 | Docket Event |
Status Conference (8:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Peca, Peter S.)
Judge: Peca, Peter S. Converted Disposition:Party: SALAZAR, FRED Disposition: DEFAULT JUDGMNT |
|
August 28, 2001 | Docket Event |
Notice of Default Judgment
Judge: Peca, Peter S. Converted Disposition:Party: SALAZAR, FRED Disposition: DEFAULT JUDGMNT |
|
August 23, 2001 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default Judgment
Judge: Peca, Peter S. Converted Disposition:Party: SALAZAR, FRED Disposition: DEFAULT JUDGMNT |
|
August 23, 2001 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Last Address
Judge: Peca, Peter S. Converted Disposition:Party: SALAZAR, FRED Disposition: DEFAULT JUDGMNT |
|
August 23, 2001 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Fees
Judge: Peca, Peter S. Converted Disposition:Party: SALAZAR, FRED Disposition: DEFAULT JUDGMNT |
|
August 08, 2001 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing
Judge: Peca, Peter S. Converted Disposition:Party: SALAZAR, FRED Disposition: DEFAULT JUDGMNT |
|
January 18, 2001 | Docket Event |
CITSH
Judge: Peca, Peter S. Converted Disposition:Party: SALAZAR, FRED Disposition: DEFAULT JUDGMNT |
|
January 18, 2001 | Docket Event |
CitationSALAZAR, FREDServed02/19/2001Response Due03/12/2001
Judge: Peca, Peter S. Converted Disposition:Party: SALAZAR, FRED Disposition: DEFAULT JUDGMNT |
|
December 18, 2000 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Original Petition
Judge: Peca, Peter S. Converted Disposition:Party: SALAZAR, FRED Disposition: DEFAULT JUDGMNT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.