Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
City Of El Paso, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Edward Hernandez, against Lozano, Mario Rene, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with Marquez, Edward S. Converted Disposition:Party: LOZANO, MARIO RENE Disposition: JUDGMENT presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMarquez, Edward S. Converted Disposition:Party: LOZANO, MARIO RENE Disposition: JUDGMENT Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 18, 2000 |
CategoryTax Suit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 19, 2011 | Docket Event |
Release of Judgment
Judge: Marquez, Edward S. Converted Disposition:Party: LOZANO, MARIO RENE Disposition: JUDGMENT |
|
April 23, 2002 | Docket Event |
Final Hearing (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Marquez, Edward S.)
Judge: Marquez, Edward S. Converted Disposition:Party: LOZANO, MARIO RENE Disposition: JUDGMENT |
|
January 25, 2002 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing
Judge: Marquez, Edward S. Converted Disposition:Party: LOZANO, MARIO RENE Disposition: JUDGMENT |
|
January 24, 2002 | Docket Event |
Final Hearing (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Marquez, Edward S.) Result: RESET
Judge: Marquez, Edward S. Converted Disposition:Party: LOZANO, MARIO RENE Disposition: JUDGMENT |
|
November 07, 2001 | Docket Event |
Tax Citation
Judge: Marquez, Edward S. Converted Disposition:Party: LOZANO, MARIO RENE Disposition: JUDGMENT |
|
November 07, 2001 | Docket Event |
CitationLOZANO, MARIO RENE Returned Unserved 12/26/2001Returned12/26/2001
Judge: Marquez, Edward S. Converted Disposition:Party: LOZANO, MARIO RENE Disposition: JUDGMENT |
|
October 01, 2001 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing
Judge: Marquez, Edward S. Converted Disposition:Party: LOZANO, MARIO RENE Disposition: JUDGMENT |
|
September 26, 2001 | Docket Event |
Status Conference (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Marquez, Edward S.) Result: RESET
Judge: Marquez, Edward S. Converted Disposition:Party: LOZANO, MARIO RENE Disposition: JUDGMENT |
|
May 07, 2001 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing
Judge: Marquez, Edward S. Converted Disposition:Party: LOZANO, MARIO RENE Disposition: JUDGMENT |
|
May 04, 2001 | Docket Event |
Status Conference (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Marquez, Edward S.)
Judge: Marquez, Edward S. Converted Disposition:Party: LOZANO, MARIO RENE Disposition: JUDGMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.