Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
City Of El Paso, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Edward Hernandez, against Warnock, Scott, represented by Robert E Kennedy, in the jurisdiction of El Paso County, TX, . El Paso County, TX Superior Courts with Conversion, Conversion Converted Disposition:Party: WARNOCK, SCOTT Disposition: NON-SUIT Party(WARNOCK, SCOTTJudgment: ( - Other presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeConversion, Conversion Converted Disposition:Party: WARNOCK, SCOTT Disposition: NON-SUIT Party(WARNOCK, SCOTTJudgment: ( - Other Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 18, 2000 |
CategoryTax Suit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationEl Paso County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Case Outcome TypeNonsuit |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 19, 2003 | Docket Event |
Order for Non-Suit
Judge: Conversion, Conversion Converted Disposition:Party: WARNOCK, SCOTT Disposition: NON-SUIT Party(WARNOCK, SCOTTJudgment: ( - Other |
|
February 07, 2003 | Docket Event |
Non-Jury Trial (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Cooper, Herb) Result: Heard
Judge: Conversion, Conversion Converted Disposition:Party: WARNOCK, SCOTT Disposition: NON-SUIT Party(WARNOCK, SCOTTJudgment: ( - Other |
|
May 06, 2002 | Docket Event |
Non-Jury Trial (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Cooper, Herb) Result: RESET
Judge: Conversion, Conversion Converted Disposition:Party: WARNOCK, SCOTT Disposition: NON-SUIT Party(WARNOCK, SCOTTJudgment: ( - Other |
|
March 08, 2002 | Docket Event |
LCC5
Judge: Conversion, Conversion Converted Disposition:Party: WARNOCK, SCOTT Disposition: NON-SUIT Party(WARNOCK, SCOTTJudgment: ( - Other |
|
March 12, 2001 | Docket Event |
Civil Service Answer Default (Response Case Event)
Judge: Conversion, Conversion Converted Disposition:Party: WARNOCK, SCOTT Disposition: NON-SUIT Party(WARNOCK, SCOTTJudgment: ( - Other |
|
January 18, 2001 | Docket Event |
CITSH
Judge: Conversion, Conversion Converted Disposition:Party: WARNOCK, SCOTT Disposition: NON-SUIT Party(WARNOCK, SCOTTJudgment: ( - Other |
|
January 18, 2001 | Docket Event |
CitationWARNOCK, SCOTTServed03/01/2001Response Received03/12/2001
Judge: Conversion, Conversion Converted Disposition:Party: WARNOCK, SCOTT Disposition: NON-SUIT Party(WARNOCK, SCOTTJudgment: ( - Other |
|
December 18, 2000 | Docket Event |
Plaintiff's Original Petition
Judge: Conversion, Conversion Converted Disposition:Party: WARNOCK, SCOTT Disposition: NON-SUIT Party(WARNOCK, SCOTTJudgment: ( - Other |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.