Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Montanez, Jaime Arturo, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Delgado, Ileana Edith, in the jurisdiction of Ector County, TX, . Ector County, TX Superior Courts 446th District Court with Billingsley, Sara K. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 23, 2023 |
CategoryDivorce With Children |
Last RefreshedJuly 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationEctor County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court House446th District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 17, 2023 | Docket Event | TRO Hearing | |
July 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Hearing | |
July 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
ORDER FOR CONTINUANCE GRANTED -07/27/2023 AT 8:45 AM |
|
July 20, 2023 | Docket Event | TRO Hearing | |
July 17, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE | |
July 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Temporary Restraining Order and ORDER SETTING HEARING FOR TEMPORARY ORDERS SET FOR AUGUST 17, 2023 AT 8:45 AM |
|
July 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Temporary Restraining Order RETURNED TO ATTORNEY |
|
July 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Temporary Restraining Order and ORDER SETTING HEARING FOR TEMPORARY ORDERS SET FOR JULY 20, 2023 AT 8:45 AM |
|
July 06, 2023 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL ANSWER | |
July 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
COUNTERCLAIM FOR DIVORCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.