Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Hall, Christopher Allen, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Hall, Jackie Nichole, in the jurisdiction of Ector County, TX, . Ector County, TX Superior Courts 446th District Court with Billingsley, Sara K. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 14, 2022 |
CategoryDivorce With Children |
Last RefreshedJuly 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationEctor County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court House446th District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Final Hearing set from PT 6/23/23 (6 min/30 min request) |
|
June 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Pre-Trial Hearing | |
June 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
ORDER SETTING FINAL HEARING SET FOR: 07/25/2023 AT 10:00 AM |
|
May 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
ORDER SETTING PRE-TRIAL HEARING SET FOR: JUNE 23, 2023 AT 10:00AM |
|
April 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Drug Screen Results / Report 90 DAYS |
|
April 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Drug Screen Results / Report 180 DAYS |
|
April 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Drug Screen Results / Report (COLLECTED ON 03/29/2023) APPROX 1 YEAR |
|
April 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF LEAD COUNSEL |
|
March 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Drug Screen Results / Report (COLLECTED ON 03/29/2023) APPROX 1 YEAR |
|
March 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
ORDER FOR SPONTANEOUS DRUG SCREEN AND ORDER RESETTING HEARING FOR TEMPORARY ORDERS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.