Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Medrano, Francisca, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Medrano, Humberto, in the jurisdiction of Ector County, TX, . Ector County, TX Superior Courts 446th District Court with Billingsley, Sara K. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBillingsley, Sara K. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 31, 2021 |
CategoryDivorce No Children |
Last RefreshedDecember 11, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationEctor County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court House446th District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Pre-Trial Hearing | |
October 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
ORDER SETTING PRE-TRIAL HEARING SET FOR: DECEMBER 10, 2021 AT 10:00 AM |
|
September 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Waiver of Service | |
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Service Returned Served - by Private Process Server | |
September 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Citation EMAILED TO ATTY |
|
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event | Vital Statistics Information (Form VS-165) | |
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event | Original Petition for Divorce (OCA) | |
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Cover Sheet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.