Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
Myles, Coneesha Nicole, filed a(n) Custody,Visitation - Family case against Johnson, Edward Charles, Jr., in the jurisdiction of Ector County, TX, . Ector County, TX Superior Courts 446th District Court with Billingsley, Sara K. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBillingsley, Sara K. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 24, 2021 |
CategoryModification - Other |
Last RefreshedMay 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationEctor County, TX |
Matter TypeCustody,Visitation |
Filing Court House446th District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Final Hearing | |
May 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Dismissal Docket | |
April 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
ORDER RESETTING HEARING FINAL SET FOR: MAY 16, 2023 |
|
April 12, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR SUBSTITUTED SERVICE | |
February 24, 2023 | Docket Event | INTERVENTION FILED BY OAG | |
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR SERVICE BY PUBLICATION | |
January 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
ORDER SETTING FINAL HEARING SET FOR: MAY 2, 2023 AT 10:00 AM |
|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Dismissal Docket | |
November 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order SETTING PRE-TRIAL HEARING. CASE IS ON THE DISMISSAL DOCKET, ATTENDANCE IS MANDATORY. |
|
September 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Docket Entry: Notice of Dismissal Docket Hearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.