Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Meek, Donna Lynn, Meek, Wallace Blakely, filed a(n) Custody,Visitation - Family case against Meek, Donna Lynn, Jimenez, Bartolo James, in the jurisdiction of Ector County, TX, . Ector County, TX Superior Courts 446th District Court with Billingsley, Sara K. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 21, 2018 |
CategoryCustody Or Visitation |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationEctor County, TX |
Matter TypeCustody,Visitation |
Filing Court House446th District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 27, 2020 | Docket Event | Final Hearing | |
January 27, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER in SAPCR (OCA - closes case) | |
January 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Judge's Docket Note Signed Order in Suit Affecting the Parent-Child Relationship after hearing. Ruled and Rendered from the Bench. By Sara Kate Billingsley |
|
April 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
Temporary Order IN SUIT TO MODIFY PARENT-CHILD RELATIONSHIP |
|
April 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
10-DAY LETTER - REQUESTS ENTRY OF ORDER IF NO OBJECTION MADE TEMPORARY ORDERS IN SUIT TO MODIFY PARENT CHILD RELATIONSHIP |
|
February 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
Judge's Docket Note Parties appeared and announced ready with an agreement for the Court to consider with the biological father Bartolo Jimenez. Agreement put on the record, accepted and affirmed in its entirety by the Court. Sarah Meek failed to appear and was defaulted. All requested relief granted. Ruled and Rendered from the Bench. By Sara Kate Billingsley |
|
February 07, 2019 | Docket Event | TRO Hearing | |
February 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
Service Returned Served BY TRO |
|
February 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
Service Returned Served BY CITATION |
|
February 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
Service Returned Served BY CITATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.