Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Franco, John, Leyba, Eliana Christine, filed a(n) Custody,Visitation - Family case against Leyba, Eliana, Franco, John Matthew, Jr., in the jurisdiction of Ector County, TX, . Ector County, TX Superior Courts 446th District Court with Billingsley, Sara K. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 23, 2018 |
CategoryModification - Other |
Last RefreshedDecember 15, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationEctor County, TX |
Matter TypeCustody,Visitation |
Filing Court House446th District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Dismissal Docket | |
November 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER ALLOWING ATTORNEY TO WITHDRAW DISMISSAL DOCKET HEARING SET FOR DECEMBER 16, 2022 AT 9:00 AM |
|
October 31, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL | |
September 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Docket Entry: Notice of Dismissal Docket Hearing | |
September 16, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS | |
June 03, 2021 | Docket Event | TRO Hearing | |
June 03, 2021 | Docket Event | ANSWER | |
May 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Temporary Restraining Order EMAILED TO ATTY |
|
May 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Temporary Restraining Order and ORDER SETTING HEARING FOR TEMPORARY ORDERS SET FOR JUNE 3, 2021 AT 8:45 AM |
|
January 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Cover Sheet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.