Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bateman, Isaac, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Bateman, Amanda, in the jurisdiction of Ector County, TX, . Ector County, TX Superior Courts 446th District Court with Billingsley, Sara K. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBillingsley, Sara K. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2017 |
CategoryDivorce No Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationEctor County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court House446th District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Signing of Divorce Decree | |
October 18, 2018 | Docket Event | FINAL DECREE OF DIVORCE - Non Jury (OCA) | |
June 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Judge's Docket Note Default hearing for Final Decree- Respondent served, answered and notices of filing hearing. 20 minute grace period allowed, no show. Divorce granted. Ruled and Rendered from the Bench. By Sara Kate Billingsley |
|
June 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Final Hearing | |
June 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Inventory, Appraisement and List of Claims | |
April 06, 2018 | Docket Event | Pre-Trial Hearing | |
April 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
ORDER SETTING FINAL HEARING ON 06/27/18 AT 1:30 PM |
|
February 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
ORDER SETTING HEARING PRE-TRIAL IS SET FOR APRIL 6, 2018 AT 10:00 A.M. |
|
January 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Original Answer PRO SE RESPONDENT'S ORIGINAL ANSWER |
|
January 22, 2018 | Docket Event | Service Returned Served |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.