Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Contreras, Indira, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Edwards, Richard, in the jurisdiction of Ector County, TX, . Ector County, TX Superior Courts 446th District Court with Billingsley, Sara K. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBillingsley, Sara K. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 20, 2017 |
CategoryProtective Order |
Last RefreshedJanuary 01, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationEctor County, TX |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Filing Court House446th District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF DISMISSAL-WANT OF PROSECUTION (OCA) DWOP Docket of 12-12-2018 |
|
December 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Dismissal Docket | |
September 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS SET FOR DISMISSAL DOCKET HEARING AT 9:00 AM ON DECEMBER 12, 2018 |
|
February 02, 2018 | Docket Event | Protective Order | |
January 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Service Returned Served NOTICE ON APP FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER RETURNED SERVED ON January 22, 2018 AT 2:52 PM BY DAVID FRANCO |
|
January 18, 2018 | Docket Event | Protective Order | |
January 18, 2018 | Docket Event | TEMPORARY EX-PARTE PROTECTIVE ORDER | |
December 20, 2017 | Docket Event | Instruction Sheet to Clerk | |
December 20, 2017 | Docket Event | APPLICATION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER (OCA) | |
December 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
Service OF PROCESS INFORMATION SHEET |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.