Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
George, Erica L, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against George, Eddie Deedward, in the jurisdiction of Ector County, TX, . Ector County, TX Superior Courts 446th District Court with Billingsley, Sara K. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 24, 2017 |
CategoryDivorce With Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationEctor County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court House446th District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF DISMISSAL-WANT OF PROSECUTION (OCA) DWOP Docket of 12-12-2018 |
|
December 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Dismissal Docket | |
September 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS SET FOR DISMISSAL DOCKET HEARING AT 9:00 AM ON DECEMBER 12, 2018 |
|
September 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
Service Returned Unserved CITATION RETURNED UNSERVED |
|
July 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
Citation GAVE TO SHERIFF FOR SERVICE |
|
July 24, 2017 | Docket Event | Original Petition for Divorce (OCA) | |
July 24, 2017 | Docket Event | Case Information Sheet | |
July 24, 2017 | Docket Event | Vital Statistics Information (Form VS-165) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.