Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bueno, Heidi Rose, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Bueno, Jeremy Scott, in the jurisdiction of Ector County, TX, . Ector County, TX Superior Courts 446th District Court with Billingsley, Sara K. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 13, 2016 |
CategoryDivorce No Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationEctor County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court House446th District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 14, 2017 | Docket Event | Vital Statistics Information (Form VS-165) | |
March 13, 2017 | Docket Event | Final Hearing | |
March 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE LAST KNOWN MAILING ADDRESS FOR JEREMY SCOTT BUENO |
|
March 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
Judge's Docket Note Signed Final Decree. Jay Gibson Senior District Judge Sitting by Assignment - Docket Entry by Michelle Conn |
|
March 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
FINAL DECREE OF DIVORCE - Non Jury (OCA) JUDGE JAY GIBSON SIGNED ORDER ON 3/13/17 |
|
January 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
Service Returned Served BY CITATION (WAS FILED TWICE) |
|
January 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
AMENDED PETITION Original Petition for Divorce |
|
January 23, 2017 | Docket Event | Citation | |
January 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
Service Returned Served BY CITATION |
|
January 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
AMENDED PETITION ORIGINAL FOR DIVORCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.