Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Cabezuela , Rosaleen Carrasco, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Cabezuela, Raul Fernando, in the jurisdiction of Ector County, TX, . Ector County, TX Superior Courts 446th District Court with Billingsley, Sara K. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 08, 2016 |
CategoryDivorce With Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationEctor County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court House446th District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 09, 2018 | Docket Event | Show Cause | |
November 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF NONSUIT - on a Re-Open (OCA) OF ENFORCEMENT ACTION |
|
November 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR NONSUIT OF ENFORCEMENT ACTION |
|
September 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Qualified Domestic Relations Order | |
September 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
ORDER SETTING HEARING ON MOTION TO ENFORNCE IS SET FOR NOVEMBER 9, 2018 AT 1:30 P.M. |
|
August 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
No Service Requested AT THIS TIME |
|
August 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion to Modify and Enforce - Reopen (OCA) Motion to Enforce |
|
May 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Vital Statistics Information (Form VS-165) | |
April 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Signing of Divorce Decree | |
April 26, 2018 | Docket Event | FINAL DECREE OF DIVORCE - Non Jury (OCA) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.