Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Moore, John, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Moore, Lora Nicolette, in the jurisdiction of Ector County, TX, . Ector County, TX Superior Courts 446th District Court with Billingsley, Sara K. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBillingsley, Sara K. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 08, 2015 |
CategoryDivorce With Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationEctor County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court House446th District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
Request District Clerk letter |
|
August 04, 2017 | Docket Event | Qualified Domestic Relations Order | |
July 31, 2017 | Docket Event |
Letter to Judge Billingsley |
|
June 13, 2017 | Docket Event | Vital Statistics Information (Form VS-165) | |
May 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
Judge's Docket Note Signed Final Decree of Divorce. -By Sara Kate Billingsley |
|
May 05, 2017 | Docket Event |
FINAL DECREE OF DIVORCE - Non Jury (OCA) /ORDER IN SUIT TO MODIFY PARENT-CHILD RELATIONSHIP |
|
April 18, 2017 | Docket Event |
Hearing to Enter Orders |
|
March 29, 2017 | Docket Event |
ORDER SETTING HEARING ON PROPOSED FINAL DECREE OF DIVORCE AT 10:30 AM |
|
March 22, 2017 | Docket Event | MOTION TO SET HEARING ON PROPOSED FINAL DECREE OF DIVORCE | |
March 01, 2017 | Docket Event | Letter |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.