Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Hungerford, Casey, filed a(n) Paternity - Family case against Johnson, Maxie, in the jurisdiction of Ector County, TX, . Ector County, TX Superior Courts 446th District Court with Sara Kate Billingsley presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSara Kate Billingsley Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 01, 2015 |
CategoryParentage/Paternity/Voluntary Legitimation |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationEctor County, TX |
Matter TypePaternity |
Filing Court House446th District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 10, 2017 | Docket Event | Docket Sheet | |
January 04, 2017 | Docket Event |
Judge's Docket Note 12/14/2016 - Signed Order of Dismissal. -By Sara Kate Billingsley |
|
December 14, 2016 | Docket Event | Dismissal Docket | |
December 14, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL-WANT OF PROSECUTION (OCA) | |
October 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order DISMISSAL DOCKET DECEMBER 14, 2016 |
|
March 03, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order to Withdraw of Counsel-Laura Carpenter |
|
February 29, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion to Withdraw Motion for Withdrawal of Counsel |
|
February 19, 2016 | Docket Event | INTERVENTION | |
February 12, 2016 | Docket Event |
AMENDED PETITION to Adjudicate Parentage |
|
December 28, 2015 | Docket Event |
ANSWER Corrected Answer |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.