Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Esparza, Claudia Iniguez, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Esparza, Jesus A., in the jurisdiction of Ector County, TX, . Ector County, TX Superior Courts 446th District Court with Billingsley, Sara K. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 05, 2015 |
CategoryDivorce With Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationEctor County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court House446th District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 04, 2017 | Docket Event |
Judge's Docket Note 12/14/2016 - Signed Order of Dismissal. -By Sara Kate Billingsley |
|
December 14, 2016 | Docket Event | Dismissal Docket | |
December 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
DISMISSAL - Other (OCA) ORDER OF DISMISSAL |
|
October 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order DISMISSAL DOCKET. SET FOR DECEMBER 14, 2016 AT 8:45 AM. |
|
October 19, 2015 | Docket Event |
TRO Hearing Cancelled due to Parties working on marriage - spoke to Kathryn at L. Carpenter's office |
|
October 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
Service Returned Served Return of service on Jesus A. Esparza for TRO, Show Cause, and Citation |
|
October 06, 2015 | Docket Event |
Temporary Restraining Order E-Noice citation to plaintiffs' attorney per instructions |
|
October 05, 2015 | Docket Event | Original Petition for Divorce (OCA) | |
October 05, 2015 | Docket Event | Docket Sheet | |
October 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
Temporary Restraining Order and Order Setting Hearing for Temporary Orders |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.