Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Conn Appliances, Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Brogan, Colin Patrick, Hale, Megan Kathleen, Kitz, Nathanial David, Olsen-Zhang, Jessica Kim, against Olivas, Nicole M, in the jurisdiction of Ector County, TX, . Ector County, TX Superior Courts 358th District Court with Shrode, John presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 27, 2023 |
CategoryDebt/Contract - Debt/Contract < $250K |
Last RefreshedDecember 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationEctor County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court House358th District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Service Returned Served - by Private Process Server ON 10/24/2023 AT 6:03 PM |
|
October 19, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR SUBSTITUTED SERVICE | |
October 19, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTED SERVICE | |
September 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Citation EMAILED TO RSIEHCOURTS@ABCLEGAL |
|
September 27, 2023 | Docket Event | CIVIL PROCESS REQUEST | |
September 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Original Petition (OCA) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.