Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Smith, William, Jr., filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Jones, Chad Everett, against M&W Hot Oil, Inc., Figueroa, Gerardo Acosta, represented by Smith, Laura Anne, Dorfner, Aaron M., in the jurisdiction of Ector County, TX, . Ector County, TX Superior Courts 358th District Court with Shrode, John presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeShrode, John Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 26, 2021 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident > $250K |
Last RefreshedApril 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationEctor County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House358th District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 10, 2024 | Docket Event | Trial Date | |
April 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Status Conference | |
March 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
RULE 203 CERTIFICATE OF DEPOSITION (INDIRECT COURT COSTS) $1000.40 DEPOSITION OF WILLIAM SMITH, JR |
|
March 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
ORDER SETTING HEARING SET FOR:APRIL 10, 2024 AT 9:30 AM |
|
March 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
COVER LETTER WITH INSTRUCTIONS TO THE CLERK CONCERNING ATTORNEY E-MAIL FOR THIS CAUSE ONLY |
|
March 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
ORDER RESETTING HEARING SET FOR:04/06/2023 at 10:30 am |
|
March 10, 2023 | Docket Event | SCHEDULING ORDER | |
March 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Judge's Docket Note Plaintiff's attorney failed to appear. Scheduling Order issued. |
|
March 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Status Conference SET BY JUDGE; SCHEDULING COMFERENCE. |
|
January 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ORAL AND VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION OF WILLIAM SMITH, JR AMENDED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.