Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
State Of Texas filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Sanchez, Johnathen Payen, in the jurisdiction of Ector County, TX, . Ector County, TX Superior Courts 358th District Court with Shrode, John presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 28, 2019 |
CategoryAdult Felony |
Last RefreshedJuly 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationEctor County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court House358th District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Final Pre-Trial Conference | |
July 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Judge's Docket Note Def has a murder case in 244th. Melissa Williams wants this case moved there. |
|
March 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
ORDER ALLOWING ATTORNEY TO WITHDRAW EMAILED TO D.A, CHAVEZ, & JAIL ON 3/29/21 BY D.L. |
|
March 16, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL | |
February 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
PRO-SE MOTION TO DISMISS. EMAILED TO CHAVEZ LAW FIRM, DA, AND FWD TO CT 02/25/2021 |
|
April 20, 2020 | Docket Event | Trial Date | |
April 15, 2020 | Docket Event | Pre-Trial Hearing | |
April 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Plea Conference | |
February 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING PLEA CONFERENCE RESCHEDULED MARCH 24, 2020 @ 1:30 PM. COPY TO T. CHAVEZ, D.A. AND JAIL BY S.C. |
|
February 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING PRE-TRIAL RESCHEDULED MARCH 26, 2020 @ 1:30 PM. COPY TO T. CHAVEZ, D.A. AND JAIL BY S.C. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.