Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
State Of Texas filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Smith, Ebb, represented by Fletcher, Don R, in the jurisdiction of Ector County, TX, . Ector County, TX Superior Courts 358th District Court with Trotter, W. Stacy presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 17, 2018 |
CategoryAdult Felony |
Last RefreshedDecember 29, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationEctor County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court House358th District Court |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
MOTION & ORDER OF DISMISSAL VICTIM HAS BEEN UNCOOPERATIVE. CC TO D. FLETCHER, D.A, AND JAIL ON 05/15/2020 BY CQ |
|
May 15, 2020 | Docket Event | Docket Sheet | |
May 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
AGREED ORDER DETERMINING COMPETENCY CC: D.A. AND DON FLETCHER BY AG 05/14/2020 |
|
May 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
ORDER FOR PAYMENT OF PSYCHOLOGIST $700 TO PERRY M. MARCHIONI, PH.D FOR CASES D-18-2368-CR AND D-18-2369-CR. CC TO P. MARCHIONI AND AUDITOR ON 05/14/2020 BY CQ |
|
May 12, 2020 | Docket Event | PSYCHOLOGICAL EVALUATION | |
April 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
ORDER FOR EXAMINATION REGARDING INCOMPETENCY E-MAILED TO D. FLETCHER, D.A, P. MARCHIONI, AND JAIL 4/3/2020 BY L.P |
|
March 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Capias Returned - Served (OCA) 03/26/2020 - FTA |
|
February 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Trial Date | |
January 27, 2020 | Docket Event | Trial Date | |
January 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Capias Issued (OCA-not sealed) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.