Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Portfolio Recovery Associates Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Stottlemyre, Scott Rhodell, against Martinez, Victor, in the jurisdiction of Ector County, TX, . Ector County, TX Superior Courts 358th District Court with Trotter, W. Stacy presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 17, 2018 |
CategoryDebt/Contract - Debt/Contract < $250K |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationEctor County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court House358th District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 13, 2019 | Docket Event | Docket Sheet | |
June 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing for default judgment |
|
May 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER SETTING HEARING HEARING SET FOR 06/13/2019 AT 2:00 P.M. |
|
May 13, 2019 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT | |
February 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
Service Returned Served IN PERSON BY LAURIE LYNN ALLEN - CERTIFIED PROCESS SERVER, ON 02/23/2019 AT 6:53 PM. |
|
December 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Citation E-MAILED TO EFILETX@EZMESSENGER |
|
December 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Original Petition (OCA) | |
December 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
CIVIL PROCESS REQUEST FOR CITATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.