Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
State Of Texas filed a(n) case against Andazola, Manuel, represented by Garcia, Robert V, in the jurisdiction of Ector County, TX, . Ector County, TX Superior Courts with W. Stacy Trotter presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeW. Stacy Trotter Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 18, 2017 |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 30, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationEctor County, TX |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 05, 2020 | Docket Event | Docket Sheet | |
August 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
MOTION & ORDER OF DISMISSAL BECAUSE THIS CASE WAS TAKEN INTO CONSIDERATION WITH A GUILTY PLEA IN CAUSE NUMBER D-18-2143-CR UNDER TEXAS PENAL CODE 12.45 ; CC: D.A. AND VICTOR TORRES BY AG 08/05/2020 |
|
August 05, 2020 | Docket Event | Guilty Plea Hearing | |
July 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF GUILTY PLEA DATE RESCHEDULED FOR 08/05/2020 @ 3:00 PM ON BOTH CASES D-17-2188-CR & D-18-2143-CR. CC TO V. TORRES/ R. GARCIA, D.A, APO, AMIGO'S BONDING/ A. MARTINEZ, AND INTERPRETER L. FOSTER BY COURT COORDINATOR S.C |
|
July 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF GUILTY PLEA DATE PLEA RESCHEDULED FOR 07/13/2020 @ 10:30 A.M.; CC: D.A., VICTOR TORRES/ ROBERT GARCIA, PSI, LINDA FOSTER, AND AMIGO'S BONDING / ALVARO MARTINEZ BY COURT COORDINATOR S.C. |
|
May 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Guilty Plea Hearing | |
April 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF GUILTY PLEA DATE RESCHEDULED FOR 05/29/2020 @ 11:00 AM IN THE 358TH DISTRICT COURTROOM. EMAILED TO V. TORRES, D.A.-D M. RAYNE, APO-PSI & ALVARO MARTINEZ, AMIGO'S BONDING BY COURT COORDINATOR S.C. |
|
June 24, 2019 | Docket Event | Trial Date | |
May 20, 2019 | Docket Event | Trial Date | |
May 13, 2019 | Docket Event | Trial Date |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.