Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Love, Johnnie Michael, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Heape, Matthew, against Progressive County Mutual Insurance Co., represented by Russell, Charles F., in the jurisdiction of Ector County, TX, . Ector County, TX Superior Courts 358th District Court with Trotter, W. Stacy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTrotter, W. Stacy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 20, 2017 |
CategoryMotor Vehicle Accident > $250K |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationEctor County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court House358th District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF DISMISSAL ON MOTION BY PLAINTIFF (OCA) WITH PREJUDICE |
|
September 11, 2020 | Docket Event | Docket Sheet | |
September 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE |
|
July 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Deposition CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE OF DELIVERY OF DEPOSITION ON WRITTEN QUESTIONS TO CNA INSURANCE aka CONTINENTAL CASUALTY COMPANY - $543.90 COURT COST APPLIED TO DEFENDANT |
|
July 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF INTENT TO TAKE DEPOSITION AMENDED |
|
June 22, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF INTENT TO TAKE DEPOSITION TO CUSTODIAN OF RECORDS FROM FIRST PHYSICIANS-MEDICAL |
|
June 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE/DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESS(ES) DEFENDANT'S FIRST AMENDED |
|
May 26, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF INTENT TO TAKE DEPOSITION TO CUSTODIAN OF RECORDS FOR VICTORIA FIRE AND CASUALTY-CLAIM FILE |
|
May 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF DELIVERY (COMPLETED DEPO BY WRITTEN QUESTIONS) $125.98 CHARGED TO ATTY CHARLES F. RUSSELL FOR DEPO FROM MEDICAL CENTER HOSPITAL-BILLING |
|
May 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Trial Date |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.