Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
State Of Texas filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Burdier, Rudy, represented by Guardiola, Israel P, in the jurisdiction of Ector County, TX, . Ector County, TX Superior Courts 358th District Court with Trotter, W. Stacy presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 19, 2016 |
CategoryAdult Felony |
Last RefreshedJanuary 01, 2022 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationEctor County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court House358th District Court |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
LETTER TO JUDGE A COPY OF THIS LETTER WAS ALREADY FILED AND SENT. NO NOTIFICATIONS WERE SENT. |
|
November 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
REVIEWED BY COURT (No Action Noted; Not Granted or Denied) LETTER FROM MARIA & ANSELMO BOURDIER. |
|
November 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
REVIEWED BY COURT (No Action Noted; Not Granted or Denied) LETTER FROM JOSE AVILA |
|
November 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
LETTER TO JUDGE FROM JONATHAN BURDIER, EMAILED TO I. GUARDIOLA, D.A AND FWD TO C.T ON 11/28/18 BY L.A |
|
November 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
LETTER TO JUDGE FROM JONATHAN BURDIER, EMAILED TO I. GUARDIOLA, D.A AND FWD TO C.T ON 11/28/18 BY L.A |
|
November 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
REVIEWED BY COURT (No Action Noted; Not Granted or Denied) FROM JONATHAN BURDIER TO JUDGE TROTTER. |
|
November 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
LETTER TO JUDGE FROM JONATHAN BURDIER, EMAILED TO I. GUARDIOLA, D.A AND FWD TO C.T ON 11/28/18 BY L.A |
|
April 23, 2018 | Docket Event | PEN PACK TO SO | |
April 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
ORDER ADJUDICATING GUILT CC TO I. GUARDIOLA, AND COMPLIANCE 04/17/2018 BY CA |
|
April 10, 2018 | Docket Event | Docket Sheet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.