Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
State Of Texas filed a(n) case against Wagner, Jeffery Wayne, represented by Myrick, Larry, in the jurisdiction of Ector County, TX, . Ector County, TX Superior Courts with W. Stacy Trotter presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 05, 2016 |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 01, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationEctor County, TX |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 17, 2017 | Docket Event | Trial Date | |
April 13, 2017 | Docket Event | Pre-Trial Hearing | |
April 11, 2017 | Docket Event | Plea Conference | |
March 29, 2017 | Docket Event | PEN PACK TO SO | |
March 29, 2017 | Docket Event |
DEFENDANT'S REQUEST TO BE RELEASED; REVIEWED BY JUDGE ON 03/28/2017 |
|
March 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
PRO-SE MOTION CC-L.MYRICK 3/30/17 BF |
|
March 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
DEFENDANT'S REQUEST REVIEWED BY JUDGE ON 03/30/17 |
|
March 23, 2017 | Docket Event | Docket Sheet | |
March 22, 2017 | Docket Event | Guilty Plea Hearing | |
March 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT OF CONVICTION SENT TO L. MYRICK AND COMPLIANCE 03/23/17 VG |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.