Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
21St Mortgage Corporation, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Mckinney, Richard, Vela, Vince Michael, against Garcia, Cuahutemoc, in the jurisdiction of Ector County, TX, . Ector County, TX Superior Courts County Court at Law #2 with Clark, Christopher M presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 23, 2023 |
CategoryDebt/Contract - Debt/Contract < $250K |
Last RefreshedDecember 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationEctor County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseCounty Court at Law #2 |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR REHEARING MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT |
|
December 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Service Returned Served - by Private Process Server ON 11/04/2023 AT 4:28 PM |
|
December 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order of Deny OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT |
|
November 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT of Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment |
|
November 30, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT | |
November 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT of Richard A. McKinney |
|
November 30, 2023 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF LAST KNOWN ADDRESS | |
November 30, 2023 | Docket Event | NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT | |
October 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Original Petition (OCA) Plaintiff's Original Petition |
|
October 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Citation EMAILED TO csulla@higierallen |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.