Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Td Bank Usa, N.A. As Successor In Interest To Target National Bank, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by White, Cameron, White, Christopher Kyle, against Valdez, Maria D, in the jurisdiction of Ector County, TX, . Ector County, TX Superior Courts County Court at Law #2 with Clark, Christopher M presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 06, 2016 |
CategoryDebt/Contract - Debt/Contract < $250K |
Last RefreshedJanuary 19, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationEctor County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseCounty Court at Law #2 |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 16, 2024 | Docket Event | OATH OF RECEIVER | |
January 11, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER APPOINTING RECEIVER | |
January 10, 2024 | Docket Event | APPLICATION FOR POST-JUDGMENT RECEIVERSHIP (CPRC Sec 31.002) | |
January 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER APPOINTING RECEIVER | |
December 29, 2023 | Docket Event | APPLICATION FOR POST-JUDGMENT RECEIVERSHIP (CPRC Sec 31.002) | |
March 05, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER APPOINTING RECEIVER | |
March 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
APPLICATION FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF A RECEIVER |
|
October 28, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT MAILED TO DEFENDANT | |
October 24, 2019 | Docket Event | DEFAULT JUDGMENT (OCA) | |
October 22, 2019 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF LAST KNOWN ADDRESS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.