Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Mahan, Dylan James, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Kraft, Cassandra Nichole, in the jurisdiction of Ector County, TX, . Ector County, TX Superior Courts 446th District Court with Billingsley, Sara K. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBillingsley, Sara K. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2017 |
CategoryDivorce No Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationEctor County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court House446th District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Signing of Divorce Decree | |
March 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Judge's Docket Note Final hearing on divorce. P appeared in person. R signed waiver and decree. Evidence heard. Signed Final Decree of Divorce. Dean Rucker Senior Judge Sitting by Assignment |
|
March 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Final Hearing | |
March 12, 2018 | Docket Event | FINAL DECREE OF DIVORCE - Non Jury (OCA) | |
February 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order of Transfer to the 446th District Court BULK/BLANKET TRANSFER - ALL PENDING FAMILY CASES TO 446TH DISTRICT COURT |
|
February 02, 2018 | Docket Event | Pro Se Request For Final Hearing | |
February 02, 2018 | Docket Event | Waiver of Service | |
December 28, 2017 | Docket Event | No Service Requested | |
December 28, 2017 | Docket Event | Vital Statistics Information (Form VS-165) | |
December 28, 2017 | Docket Event | Original Petition for Divorce (OCA) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.