Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Gonzales, Rosa G, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Gonzales, Raymond, in the jurisdiction of Ector County, TX, . Ector County, TX Superior Courts 446th District Court with Billingsley, Sara K. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBillingsley, Sara K. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 13, 2017 |
CategoryDivorce No Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationEctor County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court House446th District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 06, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Signing of Divorce Decree | |
March 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Final Hearing | |
March 05, 2018 | Docket Event | FINAL DECREE OF DIVORCE - Non Jury (OCA) | |
March 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Judge's Docket Note Signed Final Decree of Divorce. Jay Gibson, Senior District Judge Sitting By Assignment |
|
February 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order of Transfer to the 446th District Court BULK/BLANKET TRANSFER - ALL PENDING FAMILY CASES TO 446TH DISTRICT COURT |
|
January 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
Service Returned Served CITATION BY POSTING RETURNED SERVED ON December 20, 2017 BY VICTOR TERCERO |
|
December 15, 2017 | Docket Event |
Judge's Docket Note 12-15-17 SIGNED ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR SERVICE BY POSTING; SEPARATED FOR 9 TO 10 YEARS. J A JIM BOBO |
|
December 15, 2017 | Docket Event | Order Ruling On Costs (Affirming Inability to Pay) | |
December 15, 2017 | Docket Event |
ORDER FOR SUBSTITUTED SERVICE BY POSTING IN THE COURTHOUSE |
|
December 15, 2017 | Docket Event |
Judge's Docket Note 12-15-17 SIGNED ORDER AFFIRMING INABILITY TO PAY COURT COSTS. J A JIM BOBO |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.