Case Last Refreshed: 2 weeks ago
State Of Texas filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Brinlee, Melissa, represented by Abalos, Feliz, in the jurisdiction of Ector County, TX, . Ector County, TX Superior Courts 244th District Court with Ruiz-Crutcher, Lori presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 01, 2024 |
CategoryAdult Felony |
Last RefreshedApril 20, 2024 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationEctor County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court House244th District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 29, 2024 | Docket Event | Arraignment Hearing | |
April 17, 2024 | Docket Event | PRECEPT RETURNED SERVED | |
April 17, 2024 | Docket Event |
NOTICE & COPY OF INDICTMENT WITH BOND CONDITIONS EMAILED TO F. ABALOS ON 4/17/2024 BY S.C. |
|
April 17, 2024 | Docket Event | Precept to Serve - Indictment & Bond With Special Conditions | |
April 17, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING BOND WITH SPECIAL CONDITIONS | |
April 16, 2024 | Docket Event | New Criminal Case Filed (OCA) | |
April 16, 2024 | Docket Event |
Indictment AGG SEXUAL ASSAULT CHILD (F1) 22.021(a)(2)(B) |
|
March 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
Order For Court Appointed Attorney (Criminal) NOTICE SENT BY COURT ADMIN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.