Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Texas Department Of Family And Protective Services, filed a(n) Child Protection - Family case in the jurisdiction of Ector County, TX, . Ector County, TX Superior Courts 446th District Court with Scown, Tracey presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 21, 2012 |
CategoryChild Protection |
Last RefreshedDecember 31, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationEctor County, TX |
Matter TypeChild Protection |
Filing Court House446th District Court |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 18, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER DISCHARGE DFPS as SOLE MNG CONSERVATOR (OCA on Reopen) | |
March 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion to Discharge DFPS as Sole Managing Conservator AS TO STANLEY WILLIAMS |
|
March 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
Agreement VOLUNTARY EXTENDED FOSTER CARE AGREEMENT AND FINANCIAL AGREEMENT |
|
January 18, 2019 | Docket Event | Order for Payment of Attorney Ad Litem | |
December 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
PERMANENCY HEARING ORDER AFTER FINAL ORDER, NO HEARING SET |
|
December 21, 2018 | Docket Event | Permanency Hearing - CPS | |
December 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
REPORT - Permanency Plan and Progress Report to the Court HEARING SET FOR 12/21/2018 AT 10:00 AM |
|
November 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
ORDER RESETTING HEARING 12/11/2018 AT 10:30 RESET TO 12/21/2018 AT 10:00 AM |
|
June 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Order for Payment of Attorney Ad Litem | |
June 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Permanency Hearing - CPS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.