Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Hale, Megan Kathleen, against Love, Marcey, in the jurisdiction of Ector County, TX, . Ector County, TX Superior Courts 244th District Court with Ruiz-Crutcher, Lori presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 29, 2023 |
CategoryDebt/Contract - Debt/Contract < $250K |
Last RefreshedDecember 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationEctor County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court House244th District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 29, 2023 | Docket Event | DEFAULT JUDGMENT (OCA) | |
November 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT MAILED TO DEFENDANT AT ADDRESS SHOWN IN THE CERTIFICATE OF DEFENDANT'S LAST KNOWN ADDRESS FILED WITH THIS OFFICE |
|
November 22, 2023 | Docket Event | COVER LETTER WITH INSTRUCTIONS TO THE CLERK | |
November 22, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT | |
November 22, 2023 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF LAST KNOWN ADDRESS | |
October 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Service Returned Served - by Private Process Server ON 10/07/2023 AT 12:57 PM |
|
September 29, 2023 | Docket Event | CIVIL PROCESS REQUEST | |
September 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Original Petition (OCA) | |
September 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
Citation EMAILED TO ATTORNEY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.