Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
State Of Texas filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Sanchez, Jesse Alan, represented by Mansur, D. Bret, in the jurisdiction of Ector County, TX, . Ector County, TX Superior Courts 244th District Court with Rush, James presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 19, 2021 |
CategoryAdult Felony |
Last RefreshedSeptember 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationEctor County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court House244th District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Trial Date | |
September 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Hearing Bond reduction and bond condition modification |
|
September 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL FILED BY JOHANNA CURRY |
|
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Pre-Trial Hearing | |
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Plea Conference | |
August 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion to Modify Bond Conditions | |
August 24, 2021 | Docket Event | APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS | |
July 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
REVIEWED BY COURT (No Action Noted; Not Granted or Denied) E-MAILED TO B MANSUR ANDA DA 07/22/2021 BY L.P |
|
July 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS SEEKING RELEASE BECAUSE OF DELAY. EMAILED TO B. MANSUR AND DA ON 07/19/2021 BY HR |
|
July 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
REVIEWED BY COURT (No Action Noted; Not Granted or Denied) E-MAILED TO B. MANSUR AND DA 07/13/2021 BY L.P |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.