Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Adeogun, Olawale Opemipo, Hale, Megan Kathleen, against Carson, Glen, in the jurisdiction of Ector County, TX, . Ector County, TX Superior Courts 244th District Court with Rush, James presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 18, 2018 |
CategoryDebt/Contract - Debt/Contract < $250K |
Last RefreshedMay 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationEctor County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court House244th District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing APPOINTING RECEIVER |
|
April 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING SET FOR: THURSDAY, MAY 18, 2023 @ 9:30 AM |
|
April 24, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR POST-JUDGMENT RECEIVERSHIP (CPRC Sec. 31.002) | |
February 24, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFAULT JUDGMENT (OCA) | |
February 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT MAILED TO DEFENDANT AT ADDRESS SHOWN IN THE CERTIFICATE OF DEFENDANT'S LAST KNOWN ADDRESS FILED WITH THIS OFFICE |
|
February 19, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT | |
February 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
COVER LETTER WITH INSTRUCTIONS TO THE CLERK CVR LTR - Mtn for Default Judgment |
|
February 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF LAST KNOWN ADDRESS Certificate of Last Known Mailing Address - Glen Carson |
|
March 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
Service Returned Served ON 03/12/19 AT 11:11 AM AT FRONT ENTRANCE OF ADDRESS BY SUBSTITUTE SERVICE BY PPS |
|
March 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER FOR SUBSTITUTED SERVICE FOR SERVING GLEN A CARSON |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.