Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Rangel, Antonio, Gibson, Derek, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Hoffman, Zach, against Wilson, Kevin, in the jurisdiction of Ector County, TX, . Ector County, TX Superior Courts 244th District Court with Rush, James presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 14, 2016 |
CategoryDebt/Contract - Fraud/Misrepresentation > $250K |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationEctor County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court House244th District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 04, 2018 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Service SERVED MARCH 19, 2018 BY SELISA HARKEY |
|
February 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Service Returned Unserved CITATION RETURNED UNSERVED |
|
January 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
Citation SENT TO SHERIFF |
|
December 28, 2017 | Docket Event | COVER LETTER WITH INSTRUCTIONS TO THE CLERK | |
December 18, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR SUBSTITUTED SERVICE | |
December 08, 2017 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTED SERVICE | |
September 18, 2017 | Docket Event | Default Judgment | |
August 29, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order of Nonsuit ORDER GRANTING NON-SUIT OF DEFENDANT KEVIN WILSON WITHOUT PREJUDICE |
|
August 28, 2017 | Docket Event | SERVICEMEMBER'S AFFIDAVIT | |
August 28, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Non-suit of Defendant Kevin Wilson Without Prejudice |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.